THE BRIDGE CHURCH ST IVES

Charity number: 1161958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £257.71k £247.90k £203.04k £221.60k £206.72k
Total expenditure £194.21k £195.66k £197.37k £203.21k £186.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £2.00k N/A N/A N/A