THE BRIDGE CHURCH ST IVES

Charity number: 1161958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LESLIE CARLTON HOWARD Trustee 02 June 2015 None on record
CONRAD ROPER Chair 25 February 2016 None on record
ESTHER HAGEN-BROWN Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
LIZZIE ROGERS Trustee 06 July 2018 None on record
Christine Wetherill Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
MALCOLM WILLIAM ELLIS Trustee 31 March 2006 None on record