THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, SARISBURY

Charity number: 1160288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Smith Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
MR P.L. RUTT Trustee 30 April 2016
FAREHAM CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE HOMELESS IN FAREHAM AND GOSPORT Recently registered
Janet Dulledge Trustee 30 April 2019 None on record
REV A.J. MATHESON Chair 30 April 2003 None on record
John Anthony Moore Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Nigel Christopher Sutton Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
Lorraine Elizabeth Snape Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
DAVID HODGSON Trustee 31 March 2018 None on record
Robert Alexander Leslie Trustee 13 June 2021 None on record
ELAINE CHRISTINE CORDNER Trustee 30 April 2016 None on record