SEACOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505648
Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £23.83k £18.77k £5.38k £8 £0
Total expenditure £29.76k £23.60k £6.76k £1.32k £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.00k £16.68k N/A N/A N/A