Financial history THE E-NUTRITION ACADEMY

Charity number: 1162043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £270 £420 £420 £480 £480
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A