Financial history THE UNITED CHURCH OF ST PAUL'S BALSALL HEATH (ANGLICAN AND URC)

Charity number: 1160049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.80k £66.78k £80.34k £65.21k £50.27k
Total expenditure £134.60k £77.52k £77.75k £89.81k £54.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.60k £0 N/A N/A £22.00k