Accounts and annual returns ST NEOTS PLAYERS

Charity number: 1162775
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 21 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 21 July 2022 26 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 21 July 2021 08 June 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 21 July 2020 29 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 21 July 2019 29 March 2021 312 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 July 2019 Not Required