Financial history ST NEOTS PLAYERS

Charity number: 1162775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/07/2017 21/07/2018 21/07/2019 21/07/2020 21/07/2021
Total gross income £18.28k £20.48k £15.30k £17.98k £20
Total expenditure £23.70k £20.99k £19.46k £17.27k £900
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A