WEST LONDON ZONE

Charity number: 1160947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS ADAM BARNES WILKIE Trustee 28 April 2016
4ALL - BUILDING COMMUNITY IN WEST DULWICH Received: 4 days late
THE JIMMY DIXON CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Andrew Levitt Trustee 18 July 2019 None on record
SIR DAVID VEREY CBE Trustee 26 January 2016
THE FRIENDS OF LEIGHTON HOUSE Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF LEIGHTON HOUSE Received: On time
Radhika Dube Trustee 29 September 2018 None on record
Julie Howarth Trustee 04 October 2021 None on record
Jocelyn James Trustee 26 January 2016 None on record
SIR HARVEY MCGRATH Chair 24 April 2018 None on record
FELICITY GILLESPIE Trustee 19 July 2018 None on record
John Storey Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record