WATFORD AND THREE RIVERS REFUGEE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1162226
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.46k £37.22k £47.74k £47.26k £69.73k
Total expenditure £11.47k £32.47k £43.44k £50.89k £42.29k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A £5.60k