WARWICK AND KENILWORTH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 505695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £19.88k £21.43k £25.84k £20.14k £13.42k
Total expenditure £19.63k £22.47k £26.26k £20.20k £16.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A