Trustees DEADWATER VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1160737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NORA DOBSON Chair 01 September 2015
None on record
Diana Tennyson Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Tina Strickland Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Paula Bruton Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Patricia Privetti Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Paul Charman Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Grant Dawkins Trustee 15 March 2017
THE PHOENIX THEATRE & ARTS CENTRE
Received: On time
Bill Wain Trustee 01 April 2015
WOOLMER FOREST HERITAGE SOCIETY
Received: On time
MAUREEN ELIZABETH ALDRIDGE Trustee 10 June 2014
None on record
Cllr Adam Sebastian Carew Trustee 06 April 2010
None on record
JIM SMITH Trustee 15 April 2008
None on record
BOB BETTELEY Trustee 25 February 2008
None on record