Accounts and annual returns THE OXFORD SCHOOL OF THOUGHT

Charity number: 1161778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 06 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 27 May 2020 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 27 May 2020 116 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2017 12 July 2018 161 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 12 July 2018 161 days late Download Open in new window