Accounts and annual returns HEADWAY WEST LONDON

Charity number: 1160899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window