BARKING MAD DOG RESCUE

Charity number: 1160985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 04 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 12 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 12 January 2017 On time Download