BROADSTAIRS TOWN TEAM LTD

Charity number: 1163509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £55.33k £69.11k £58.84k £52.19k £31.72k
Total expenditure £19.56k £47.04k £34.81k £45.91k £52.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.99k £21.00k £600 N/A