UBUNTU UNLEASHED

Charity number: 1163046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 July 2020 07 June 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2019 18 July 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 23 July 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 July 2016 Not Required