ORAL HEALTH AFRICA

Charity number: 1160829
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 29 December 2020 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 29 December 2020 58 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 12 July 2020 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 12 July 2020 162 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2018 12 July 2020 527 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 12 July 2020 527 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2017 06 March 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 06 March 2018 33 days late Download
Annual return 01 April 2016 19 May 2017 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 06 March 2018 398 days late Download