LONDON BAT GROUP

Charity number: 1160872
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £6.58k £4.85k £4.73k £7.37k £7.38k
Total expenditure £2.03k £12.80k £974 £3.87k £5.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A