Financial history SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1163327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.85k £47.52k £25.70k £43.54k £81.55k
Total expenditure £19.51k £38.18k £47.31k £40.82k £53.78k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £22.88k £3.00k N/A £46.31k