Accounts and annual returns SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 1163327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 13 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 November 2018 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 November 2018 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window