Financial history HARROGATE RAILWAY JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1163279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.01k £11.49k £15.14k £10.21k £17.15k
Total expenditure £16.47k £10.43k £16.06k £7.26k £9.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A