Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHASETOWN
Charity number: 1160765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev RICHARD WESTWOOD | Chair | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Neil Woolley | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan McCallum | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Margaret Hawthorne | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
GERALD BERTRAM HARVEY | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES GUEST | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA GUEST | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROL THOMAS | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA ANN MURPHY | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ALLEN | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anita Brookes | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BUCKLEY | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER HAWTHORNE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA MARY BOTT | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN GOLDING | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BETTY STANLEY | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANITA BROOKES | Trustee | 29 April 1983 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.