Governing document The Places Foundation
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/11/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/08/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 DEC 2017 as amended on 02 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.