Trustees The Places Foundation
Charity number: 505813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Bonner | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Owen-Ellis Clark | Trustee | 06 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Reed | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cartwright | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Olasubomi Daniel | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Gregory | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW WINSTANLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.