Accounts and annual returns ZICHRON SHMUEL CIO

Charity number: 1161593
Charity reporting is overdue by 744 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Overdue by 13 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 379 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Overdue by 379 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 744 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Overdue by 744 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 18 April 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 18 April 2021 18 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 19 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window