ZICHRON SHMUEL CIO

Charity number: 1161593
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £19.26k £13.11k £11.39k £8.37k £11.00k
Total expenditure £1.31k £15.56k £10.18k £8.94k £16.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A