CENTRE FOR AGEING BETTER LIMITED

Charity number: 1160741
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.29m £900.95k £1.00m £1.04m £897.06k
Total expenditure £2.64m £3.46m £3.96m £5.22m £6.88m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £213.12k
Income from government grants £202.00k £0 £250.00k £34.00k £36.96k
Income - Donations and legacies £244.79k £67.23k £38.68k £63.03k £88.09k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £286.50k £105.95k £335.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.04m £833.72k £673.43k £867.17k £473.96k
Income - Other £2.00k £0 £3.00k £2.39k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.20m £3.43m £3.95m £5.12m £6.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £241.71k £24.87k £8.21k £100.01k £113.81k
Expenditure - Governance £85.56k £92.55k £56.95k £75.66k £74.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £161.96k £292.91k £69.60k £193.47k
Expenditure - Investment management £241.71k £24.87k £8.21k £100.01k £113.81k
Expenditure - Other £200.00k £0 £0 £0 £0