KHALSA AID INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1163294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tarvinder Singh Gill Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Balvinder Kaur Sandhu Trustee 01 July 2017 None on record
Amarjit Singh Bansal Trustee 10 March 2016 None on record
Karamjit Kaur Grewal Trustee 09 June 2021 None on record
Sukhraj Singh Sanghera Trustee 09 June 2021 None on record
JASWINDER SINGH BAHRA Trustee 25 August 2015 None on record