AL KHIDMAH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.19k £240.75k £65.69k £191.35k £352.85k
Total expenditure £6.07k £36.98k £241.09k £77.20k £293.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A