Financial history CLWYD AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 505936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £32.12k £5.71k £4.89k £5.47k £3.44k
Total expenditure £19.80k £7.96k £6.87k £7.26k £1.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A