SNEINTON HERMITAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time Download