SNEINTON HERMITAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £25.51k £27.69k £31.81k £37.17k £16.80k
Total expenditure £27.31k £28.90k £29.00k £36.33k £27.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.36k £7.36k £8.26k £6.26k N/A