BOWDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Watson Chair 21 April 2013 None on record
THOMAS LESLIE PARKINSON Trustee 27 January 2013 None on record
Tony Wakefield Trustee 05 May 2015 None on record
Mark Gomme Trustee 14 June 2017 None on record
Barry Hurd Trustee 10 October 2017 None on record
GRAHAM REDFORD Trustee None on record