Financial history TRANSPARENT LIFE MINISTRIES (TLM)

Charity number: 1161757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £120 £120 £144 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A