CELTIC LEISURE

Charity number: 1161131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.32m £6.12m £6.16m £6.22m £6.39m
Total expenditure £5.76m £6.22m £6.41m £6.66m £7.21m
Income from government contracts £2.29m £2.11m £1.84m £1.75m £1.57m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £3.03m £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £6.12m £6.16m £6.22m £6.39m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £1.39k £3.00k £1.84k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.76m £6.22m £6.41m £6.66m £7.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £17.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0