Accounts and annual returns 1ST NEWTON AND KINGSLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 December 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 December 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 November 2017 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required