Financial history 1ST NEWTON AND KINGSLEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.88k £31.10k £11.01k £19.04k £23.15k
Total expenditure £6.90k £12.11k £10.32k £23.72k £5.67k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A £12.37k