HAMARA HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE

Charity number: 1162962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Yankuba Sawo Trustee 27 September 2018
LEEDS AFRICAN COMMUNITIES CHARITABLE TRUST (LAC TRUST) Recently registered
MOHAMMED FAROUK Trustee 17 September 2002 None on record
Zahid Hamid Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
MONEER SHARIF Trustee 29 September 2016 None on record
COUNCILLOR IQBAL Trustee 04 September 2006
LEEDS FAITHS FORUM Received: On time
Dr Noor Ahmed Baloch Trustee 17 April 2018 None on record
WASEEM KHAN Trustee 28 October 2013 None on record