Financial history Bethel Prayer House Camberley

Charity number: 1161705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £18.19k £41.32k £10.76k £10.43k £127.79k
Total expenditure £16.41k £25.77k £15.13k £31.03k £17.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A