THE SIR ROGER MANWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 1162107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £76.33k £99.47k £108.88k £110.75k £107.39k
Total expenditure £39.57k £47.19k £61.44k £77.02k £84.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A