Financial history ASSOCIATION OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS LTD

Charity number: 1163027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £39.75k £39.60k £43.65k £14.09k £7.32k
Total expenditure £52.66k £36.52k £44.58k £23.74k £8.97k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.34k £15.49k £16.00k £2.00k N/A