Financial history WREXHAM FOODBANK / BANC BWYD WRECSAM

Charity number: 1162262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.45k £31.93k £42.77k £89.52k £175.24k
Total expenditure £14.60k £19.68k £15.24k £66.87k £63.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £28.05k N/A