Trustees THE SOUSTER YOUTH TRUST

Charity number: 1162368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Edward Curtis Chair 04 February 2019
None on record
Fiona Margaret McGill Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Grace Elizabeth Read Trustee 05 February 2018
None on record
STEVEN PAUL CHADWICK BA Trustee 09 January 2017
None on record
CAROLYN ANNE BRAWN Trustee 24 June 2015
THE THORPE ACHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ARTHUR SOUSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
VERY REVD Michael Bunker Trustee 24 June 2015
THE ARTHUR SOUSTER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time