BASLOW SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.89k £9.62k £13.55k £18.05k £7.63k
Total expenditure £7.64k £11.56k £8.65k £6.09k £12.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A