Financial history EDAID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163047
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £35 £0 £0 £212.24k £783.98k
Total expenditure £161 £0 £6.72k £200.24k £289.38k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £675.63k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £108.30k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £53
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £249.38k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.00k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0