SADBERGE VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506245
Charity reporting is overdue by 769 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 38 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 403 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 403 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 769 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 769 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On time Download