NEW LIFE CHURCH, GREAT CORNARD

Charity number: 1162045
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 20 November 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 20 November 2017 20 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 October 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)