NEW LIFE CHURCH, GREAT CORNARD

Charity number: 1162045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £36.10k £36.91k £45.82k £75.45k £68.05k
Total expenditure £32.53k £38.26k £48.67k £64.94k £68.61k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A