KEGWORTH COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1162461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 June 2019 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 June 2019 148 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time Download